DE SB75 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act updates Delaware's human trafficking crime to prohibit the same acts that are included in the federal Justice for Victims of Trafficking Act of 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Trafficking Of An Individual, Forced Labor, And Sexual Servitude.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-01 Signed by Governor
2017-07-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-07-03 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-07-02 Amendment HA 1 to SB 75 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to SB 75 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-08 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2017-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2017-05-02 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback