DE SB65 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 3 NOT VOTING
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Conversion therapy is a practice or treatment that seeks to change an individuals sexual orientation or gender identity, including any effort to change behaviors or gender expressions or to eliminate or reduce sexual or romantic attractions or feelings toward individuals of the same gender. Conversion therapy has been rejected by all mainstream medical and mental health organizations, and there is no credible evidence that it is effective. Moreover, this practice poses enormous health risks to LGBTQ youth, including an increased sense of shame, guilt, hopelessness, stress, and anger, thus increasing the risk of anxiety, depression, and self-harm. The harm done by conversion therapy can last well into adulthood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 24 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conversion Therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 3 NOT VOTING
2018-06-07 Amendment HA 4 to SB 65 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 24 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-06-07 Amendment HA 3 to SB 65 - Stricken in House
2018-03-01 Amendment HA 3 to SB 65 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-05-18 ReAssigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-05-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 3 NO 4 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-05-02 ReAssigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-04-26 Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback