DE SB216 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act strengthens the shelter requirements for dogs that are kept outside by requiring the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Cruelty To Dogs And Specifications For The Humane Handling, Care, And Treatment Of Dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2018-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-28 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 216 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 216 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-14 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |