DE SB165 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act permits private sector labor organizations and employers to enter into union security agreements to the full extent allowed under federal law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Union Security Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-09 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 8 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |