DE SB105 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Persons under age 18 must wear a helmet when operating or riding as a passenger on a bicycle, motorized skateboard or scooter, all terrain vehicle (ATV), off-highway vehicle (OHV), or electric personal assistive mobility device (EPAMD). See Title 21 Del. C. ยงยง 4198K, 4198N, 6823, and 4098O respectively. This bill would achieve consistency by requiring moped and triped operators and passengers to wear a helmet if under age 18. This legislation is an initiative of the State Council for Persons with Disabilities Brain Injury Committee to reduce the incidence of brain injuries among minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Helmet Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2017-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-20 Amendment SA 1 to SB 105 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback