DE HJR2 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This joint resolution rejects the report of the Delaware Compensation Commission in its entirety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rejecting In Its Entirety The Report Of The Delaware Compensation Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02 Signed by Governor
2017-01-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-01-25 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-01-19 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2017-01-19 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-01-11 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback