DE HB8 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill seeks to expand the eligibility criteria for the Juvenile Offender Civil Citation Program by including the offense of possession of drug paraphernalia and permitting a second referral to the Juvenile Offender Civil Citation Program where the first referral occurred more than 18 months ago and was not a referral for the same offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Juvenile Offender Civil Citation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Signed by Governor
2017-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2017-05-10 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback