DE HB440 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
House Substitute No. 1 for House Bill 440 differs from House Bill 440 only in that it locates the Overdose System of Care and the Overdose System of Care Committee in Chapter 97 of Title 16 instead of in Chapter 10 of Title 16.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation Of An Overdose System Of Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 440, and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |