DE HB435 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill permits the Council of the City of Newark to impose and collect a lodging tax of no more than 3 percent on hotel and motel rooms located in the City of Newark so long as it is approved by a majority of the council pursuant to the provisions of the Charter of the City of Newark.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Newark Relating To The Powers Of Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Signed by Governor
2018-06-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-09 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-07 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 NO
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback