DE HB40 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the Family Court to order the Department of Health and Social Services ("DHSS") to determine whether a child who is 17 years old or older and in the custody of the Department of Services for Children, Youth and Their Families ("DSCYF") qualifies for adult mental or behavioral health services. If the child does qualify for adult mental or behavioral health services, this Act authorizes the Family Court to order that DHSS coordinate with DSCYF to develop and implement a transition plan for mental or behavioral health services for the child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mental And Behavioral Health Transition Plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08 Signed by Governor
2017-05-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-03-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-01-18 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback