DE HB384 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill removes an out-of-date provision in the Code that authorizes Kent County Government to employ a janitor or janitors for the care of the County Courthouse. The State purchased the Kent County Courthouse from Kent County in 2003.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Government Of Kent County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Signed by Governor
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-10 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-05-10 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback