DE HB336 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

This Act requires each public school district to equip the schools within their respective jurisdictions with an adequate number of panic buttons that may be used to immediately alert local law enforcement authorities of a security threat at a school. Once activated, the required silent alarm system will immediately alert authorities without simultaneously activating an audible alarm within the school building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Silent Alarm Systems In Public Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21 Stricken in House
2018-06-14 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-04-19 Amendment HA 2 to HB 336 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Amendment HA 1 to HB 336 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-13 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback