CA SB909 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 9 (commencing with Section 19501) to Division 9 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Trust Decanting Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4625.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Probate Code19501New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback