CA SB83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 13302, 18930.5, 19792, 19803, 19809, 19815.6, 19878, 19879.1, 19880, 19881, 19882, 19883, 19884, 19995.1.5, 22551, 22555, 22556, 22560, 22600, 22602, 22871.3, and 100014 of, to add Sections 3539.6 and 19878.5 to, and to repeal Section 12472.5 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1420, 1421, 1428, 1429, 1429.5, 1430, and 1434 of, to add Section 6717.5 to, and to add and repeal Section 1455 of, the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 984, 1088.9, and 1095 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 3301 of, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 83 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB83 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB83 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-06-17SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1598.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 2302.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100014Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12472.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code13302Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code18930.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19792Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19803Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19809Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19815.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19878Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19878.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code19879.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19880Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19881Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19882Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19883Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19884Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19995.1.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22551Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22555Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22556Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22560Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22600Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22602Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22871.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code3539.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1088.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3301New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code984Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1420Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1421Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1428Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1429Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1429.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1430Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1434Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1455Repealed CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code6717.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback