CA SB688 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5899 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services Act: revenue and expenditure reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB688 Moorlach Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 688 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB688 Moorlach (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5420.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6301.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-28AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-23SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-23SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-01-12SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2017-04-17SenateApril 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5892Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5899Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback