CA SB588 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - June 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6601 and 6602 of, to amend and renumber Sections 6612, 6614, and 6618 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 6605 of, to add Sections 6607 and 6608 to, to repeal Sections 6610, 6613, 6615, 6616, 6617, 6619, 6620, and 6621 of, to repeal the headings of Article 1 (commencing with Section 6600) and Article 2 (commencing with Section 6610) of Chapter 5.5 of Part 1 of Division 6 of, and to repeal and add Sections 6603, 6604, and 6611 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Sections 71550, 71551, and 71560 of the Public Resources Code, relating to ocean resources, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine resources and preservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB588 Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25AssemblyJune 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and NAT. RES.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback