CA SB539 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69431.8 to the Education Code, and to amend Sections 12207, 17053.87, and 23687 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to education finance, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Cal Grants: taxes: credits: College Access Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 539 De León Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB539 De León et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB539 De León et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB539 De León et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB539 De León et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6199.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6112.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 783.) (April 19). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69431.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 88910 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23687 | Amended Code | Citation Text |