CA SB227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 42127.81 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 17039 of, and to add and repeal Section 17053.88 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: Local Schools and Colleges Voluntary Contribution Fund: personal income taxes: credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 De León et al (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-25AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-06-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4124.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4055.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-11SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4019.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2018-01-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-01-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-04SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-03SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2860.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code42127.81New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17039Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17053.88New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23688New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback