CA SB1477 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 378, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 378, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 910.4 of, to add Section 748.6 to, and to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 921) and Article 13 (commencing with Section 922) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Low-emissions buildings and sources of heat energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1477 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1477 Stern Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1477 Stern (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1477 Stern Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1477 Stern (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 378, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6054.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6805.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | June 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4418.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4311.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4721.) (April 18). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4515.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25970 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 748.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 910.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |