CA SB1349 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Set for hearing April 4.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 4 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


An act to amend Sections 48412 and 51421 of the Education Code, relating to pupils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Pupils: diploma alternatives: certificate of proficiency: high school equivalency certificate.



2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code48412Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51421Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

Bill Comments