CA SB117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: average daily attendance and timeline waivers: protective equipment and cleaning appropriation: COVID–19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Assembly - SB 117 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB117 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB117 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2020.
2020-03-17 Approved by the Governor.
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2020-03-16SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3410.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-03-16Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3409.)
2020-03-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-03-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4337.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-03-16Assembly(Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4336.)
2020-03-16AssemblyArticle IV Sec. 8(b)(2) of the Constitution waived.
2020-03-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-16AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-16Assembly(Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4334.)
2020-03-16AssemblyArticle IV Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2020-03-16AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-03-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 676.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback