CA SB1151 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 1965) of, to amend Section 1965.7 of, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 1965) to Chapter 8 of, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 1966) to Chapter 8 of, Division 2.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 21251 and 21260 of the Vehicle Code, relating to neighborhood electric vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Neighborhood electric vehicles: County of San Diego.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1151 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4822.) (April 24).
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code1806Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code1965New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code21251Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code21260Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback