CA SB114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6363.9, 6363.10, 6902.5, 17053.95, 17935, 17941, 17948, 19533, 23695, 61015, 61020, and 61030 of, and to add Sections 6295, 12209, 17039.3, 17276.23, 23036, 23036.3, and 24416.23 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 426 and 4456 of, and to add Section 4750.6 to, the Vehicle Code, and to amend Section 12 of Chapter 34 of the Statutes of 2019, relating to state taxes and charges, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State taxes and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB114 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4848.) |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |