CA SB101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 17504 of the Family Code, to amend Section 6253.2 of, and to add Section 14669.22 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1267.75, 1506, 1506.3, 1517, 1531.15, and 1569.682 of, to add Section 1562.2 to, and to repeal Section 1567.70 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 246 of the Labor Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1001.20, 1001.21, 1001.22, 1001.23, and 1001.29 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4418.7, 4646.5, 4684.81, 4684.82, 4685.8, 4691.12, 7502.5, 11265, 11265.1, 11320.3, 11323.2, 11333, 11402.2, 11403.2, 11403.3, 11454.5, 11461.36, 11463, 11523, 11523.1, 12305.7, 12305.71, 15204.2, 16519.5, 16521.8, 16527, 16529, 16530, 18900.8, 18901, 18901.1, 18901.10, 18901.25, and 18927 of, to amend and repeal Sections 11322.85, 11322.86, 11322.87, and 12301.24 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 10831, 11265.2, 11265.45, 11320.15, 11322.8, 11325.21, 11325.24, 11454, and 17021 of, to add Sections 10004, 11265.15, 11454.1 18910.2, and 18918.1 to, to add and repeal Sections 11523.05 and 18906.55 of, and to repeal Sections 4684.87, 10832, and 11454.2 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB101 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 671.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |