CA ACR76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma Awareness Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent ACR76 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - ACR 76 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-04AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2019-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-05-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1384.)
2019-05-28SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-05-09AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1592.)
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2019-04-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-24AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback