CA ACR50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to workforce development.
Title
Workforce development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR50 Chiu et al. By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - ACR 50 Chiu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - ACR 50 Chiu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2517.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1638.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |