CA AB3097 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 44024.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smog check: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3097 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1596.643Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44024.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback