CA AB2717 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 177, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 177, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23577, 23578, and 23612 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driving under the influence.
Title
Driving under the influence: blood tests.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2717 LACKEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2717 Lackey By Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2717 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2717 Lackey By Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2717 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 177, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6143.). |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5109.). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5216.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23577 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23578 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |