CA AB21 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11362.777 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical marijuana, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana: cultivation licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 21 WOOD Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB21 Wood By McGuire Urgency Cla (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 21 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1, Statutes of 2016.
2016-02-03 Approved by the Governor.
2016-01-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2016-01-28AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3522.).
2016-01-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3497.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 27).
2016-01-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after January 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-01-25SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2944.).
2016-01-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 20).
2016-01-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-01-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-01-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
2016-01-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-04SenateFrom inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2015-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-29SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-06-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-28SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2015-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1484.)
2015-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2015-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2015-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_21&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20150505_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20160104_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20160115_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20160121_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20160128_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20160203_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20150427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20150513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20150518_1258PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20150617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20160113_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20160120_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20160125_0322PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20160127_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20160128_0927AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback