CA AB1811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Communications and Conveyance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 421, 422, 423, 424, 737.3, 3901, 3902, 3903, 3950, and 24243 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 3901) of Division 2 of, to add Part 3 (commencing with Section 24000) to Division 9 of, to repeal Sections 912.1, 918, 918.1, and 918.2 of, and to repeal Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 5500) of Division 2 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: for hire vessel operators: household movers: commercial air operators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-03-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
2019-03-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code24000New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code24243Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3901Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3902Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3903Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3950Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code421Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code422Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code423Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code424Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code737.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code912.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code918Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code918.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code918.2Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback