CA AB1631 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8041 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shorthand reporters: shorthand reporting service corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2017-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code8040Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8041New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback