CA AB1441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3106 and 6830.1 of the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas: development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-01-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (January 13).
2019-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code3106Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6830.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback