CA AB1322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 14 (commencing with Section 32445) to Chapter 3 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 14115.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to school health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School-based health programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1322 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1322 Berman et al. By Pan (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1322 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21 Stricken from file.
2019-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 3492.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 2857.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Coms. on ED., HEALTH and APPR.
2019-04-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 1076.)
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 2).
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code32445New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14115.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback