CA AB1065 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 281 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Communications: California Advanced Services Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1065 Jim Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1065 Jim Patterson By Dodd (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1065 Jim Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1065 Jim Patterson By Dodd (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1065 Jim Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3589.). |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2778.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1928.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |