AR SR12 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming March 2, 2018, As National Speech And Debate Education Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming March 2, 2018, As National Speech And Debate Education Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateSine Die adjournment
2018-02-28SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2018-02-22SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2018-02-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback