AR SB595 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB595 is now Act 997
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Define The Monies To Be Available In The Rainy Day Fund; And To Allow That Additional Funds May Be Made Available For State Agencies And Institutions Appropriations; And For Other Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Define The Monies To Be Available In The Rainy Day Fund; And To Allow That Additional Funds May Be Made Available For State Agencies And Institutions Appropriations; And For Other Purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB595 is now Act 997
2019-04-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-10SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-10HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-10HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-04-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-09SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-09SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-08SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-08SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback