AR SB2 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - ORDERED ENROLLED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning The Review And Approval Of Administrative Rules And The Implementation Of Article 5, Section 42, Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Review And Approval Of Administrative Rules And The Implementation Of Article 5, Section 42, Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-01 - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2015-04-01SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-31SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2015-03-31SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2015-03-31HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2015-03-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-30HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2015-03-24HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2015-03-24HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-24SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-24SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-24SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-24SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-24SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-23SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2015-01-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2014-12-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback