AR SB10 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Administrative Office Of The Courts - Court Personnel Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Administrative Office Of The Courts - Court Personnel Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-17 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #1 was withdrawn |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed |