AR HB1648 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1648 is now Act 1018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1648 is now Act 1018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Include Certain Arkansas Civil Rights Leaders And Heroes In The Teaching Materials Regarding African-american History In A Public School.
Title
To Include Certain Arkansas Civil Rights Leaders And Heroes In The Teaching Materials Regarding African-american History In A Public School.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Notification that HB1648 is now Act 1018 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-10 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |