AL SB88 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lieutenant Governor, duties and powers over Senate, removed, salary established, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lieutenant Governor, duties and powers over Senate, removed, salary established, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateFurther Consideration
2018-03-20SenateReed motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-15SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-15SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 868
2018-03-15SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-06SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 660
2018-03-06SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-06SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 658
2018-03-06SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateWilliams first Substitute Offered
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-22SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-22SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 493
2018-02-22SenateConstitution, Ethics and Elections first Substitute Offered
2018-02-22SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB88&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB88-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191544-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192083-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590103&VOTE=493&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593306&VOTE=658&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593318&VOTE=660&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597034&VOTE=868&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback