AL SB256 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, organizations that receive exemption from sales and use tax because of specific legislation shall file annually certain information to the Department of Revenue, Department of Revenue to promulgate rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, organizations that receive exemption from sales and use tax because of specific legislation shall file annually certain information to the Department of Revenue, Department of Revenue to promulgate rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-07 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2015-05-07SenateHoltzclaw motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 885
2015-05-07SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 884
2015-05-07SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 883
2015-05-07SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2015-05-07SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-04-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback