AL SB24 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-307.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bishop State Community College, Southern Union State Community College, Bevill State Community College, and the Alabama Department of Postsecondary Education, who are part of the Alabama Career Center System to Department of Labor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bishop State Community College, Southern Union State Community College, Bevill State Community College, and the Alabama Department of Postsecondary Education, who are part of the Alabama Career Center System to Department of Labor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-26 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-307.
2015-05-28HouseSignature Requested
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled
2015-05-26SenatePassed Second House
2015-05-26HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078
2015-05-26HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-04-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2015-04-14SenateEngrossed
2015-04-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433
2015-04-09SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 432
2015-04-09SenateScofield first Substitute Offered
2015-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-17SenateScofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 129
2015-03-17SenateScofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-17SenateScofield Amendment Offered
2015-03-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-03-17SenateMotion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-03-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB24
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB24-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB24-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB24-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=505083&VOTE=129&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=509753&VOTE=432&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=509754&VOTE=433&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=522379&VOTE=1078&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback