AL SB222 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Nursing, use of funds to provide financial assistance to licensees
Title
Board of Nursing, use of funds to provide financial assistance to licensees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 686 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 686 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Healthcare |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare |