AL SB198 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Employment practice, unlawful to inquire from job applicant information relating to arrests or conviction of crimes, criminal record, with exceptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment practice, unlawful to inquire from job applicant information relating to arrests or conviction of crimes, criminal record, with exceptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2018-03-22SenateEngrossed
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1019
2018-03-21SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1018
2018-03-21SenateSingleton first Substitute Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback