AL SB165 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Assigned Act No. 2015-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prosthetists and Orthotists, Board of, regulation of practice of prosthetics and orthotics, exemption of persons employed in certain facilities deleted, Sec. 34-25A-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosthetists and Orthotists, Board of, regulation of practice of prosthetics and orthotics, exemption of persons employed in certain facilities deleted, Sec. 34-25A-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-14 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-16SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-68.
2015-04-16HouseSignature Requested
2015-04-16SenateEnrolled
2015-04-14SenatePassed Second House
2015-04-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412
2015-04-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-31HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2015-03-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 206
2015-03-31SenateEngrossed
2015-03-19SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 205
2015-03-19SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2015-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB165
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB165-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB165-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB165-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=506507&VOTE=205&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=506508&VOTE=206&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=510559&VOTE=412&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback