AL HB447 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marengo County, sheriff, service of process for personal service by the sheriff, distribution to sheriff and district attorney
Title
Marengo County, sheriff, service of process for personal service by the sheriff, distribution to sheriff and district attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1076 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 707 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 91 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 706 WY1Q995-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 707 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 91 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 706 WY1Q995-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-17 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-08 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-08 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1076 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 707 |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 706 WY1Q995-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Local Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered WY1Q995-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Local Legislation WY1Q995-1 |
2024-04-17 | House | Local Legislation 1st Amendment FXV2DCD-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |