AL HB314 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small loans under Ala. Small Loan Act, minimum and maximum amount of loans increased and corresponding interest rates, max term of loans, Secs. 5-18-4, 5-18-10, 5-18-13, 5-18-15 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small loans under Ala. Small Loan Act, minimum and maximum amount of loans increased and corresponding interest rates, max term of loans, Secs. 5-18-4, 5-18-10, 5-18-13, 5-18-15 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 25th leg day Time (Y: 9 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 26th leg day (Y: 9 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseDelivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
2017-05-17HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-373.
2017-05-17HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-17SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-17HouseEnrolled
2017-05-17HousePassed Second House
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1216
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2017-05-04HouseHolmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 25th leg day Time lost Roll Call 823
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 824
2017-05-04HouseHolmes (A) motion to Carry Over Until 26th leg day lost Roll Call 822
2017-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback