AL HB101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; providing additional items to be considered election expenses that must be reimbursed to the counties by the state
Title
Elections; providing additional items to be considered election expenses that must be reimbursed to the counties by the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 417 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change NYG4TT8-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change NYG4TT8-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-24 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-11 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-10 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 417 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-29 | House | Engrossed |
2024-02-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 180 |
2024-02-29 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 179 NYG4TT8-1 |
2024-02-29 | House | W&MGF Reported Substitute Offered from House Ways and Means General Fund NYG4TT8-1 |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted NYG4TT8-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted 9TRHBPM-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-05 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB27 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund