AK HJR14 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the Federal Communications Commission to increase the Rural Health Care Program budget sufficiently to adjust for inflation, advances in technology and the services available with increased broadband, and the increase in demand for broadband-based services and provide for any unused funds to be carried forward to future funding years, ensuring that rural communities in the state continue to have access to affordable broadband telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fcc: Increase Rural Health Care Budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-04-15SenateFN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
2017-04-15SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, MICCICHE
2017-04-15SenateHSS RPT 3DP
2017-04-06SenateHSS
2017-04-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-05HouseVERSION: HJR 14
2017-04-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, TARR
2017-04-05HousePASSED Y33 N6 A1
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
2017-04-03HouseHELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR
2017-03-31HouseHELD TO 4/3 CALENDAR
2017-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE, SPOHNHOLZ, GUTTENBERG, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2017-03-29HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR
2017-03-29HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-29HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2017
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(H.L&C)
2017-03-24HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO
2017-03-24HouseL&C RPT 7DP
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-03-06HouseL&C
2017-03-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback