AK HB262 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE, EGAN, MEYER
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to temporary courtesy licenses for certain nonresident professionals; and relating to the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Spouse Courtesy License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE, EGAN, MEYER
2018-04-23SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-04-23SenateFN3: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-23SenateDP: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE, MEYER, GARDNER
2018-04-23SenateL&C RPT 5DP
2018-04-14SenateL&C, FIN
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-13HouseVERSION: CSHB 262(L&C)
2018-04-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STUTES, TUCK, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, TARR
2018-04-13HousePASSED Y40
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 262(L&C)
2018-04-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-13HouseL&C CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
2018-04-05HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-04-05HouseNR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO
2018-04-05HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-04-05HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 4NR
2018-03-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-02-16HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-02-16HouseAM: RAUSCHER
2018-02-16HouseDP: SADDLER, PARISH, LEDOUX, TUCK
2018-02-16HouseMLV RPT CS(MLV) 4DP 1AM
2018-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2018-01-16HouseMLV, L&C
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-08HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback